THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:06:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
203 McCaul Street, 4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-0513
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MICHAEL O'KEEFFE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Keeffe (CPSO#: 110472 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
203 McCaul Street, 4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-0513
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MICHAEL O'KEEFFE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Keeffe (CPSO#: 110472 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL EZRA O'KEEFFE may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL EZRA O'KEEFFE may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2016