THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:47:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
HAmilton General Hospital
Department of Surgery
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 46781
Fax: 18559130467
Address: 4-1500 Dakota St
Winnipeg MB R2N 3Y7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
HAmilton General Hospital
Department of Surgery
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 46781
Fax: 18559130467
Address: 4-1500 Dakota St
Winnipeg MB R2N 3Y7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINA AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINA AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016