THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad El Bosque, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Northeast Cancer Centre
4th floor
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-6237
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
and Haematology
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Aug 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. L. F. BONILLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bonilla (CPSO#: 110526 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad El Bosque, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Northeast Cancer Centre
4th floor
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-6237
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
and Haematology
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Aug 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. L. F. BONILLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bonilla (CPSO#: 110526 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Aug 2021
10 May 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 16 2021
EXPIRY DATE: May 10 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LUISA FERNANDA BONILLA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. BONILLA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BONILLA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BONILLA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BONILLA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 August, 2021, and expires on 10 May, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. BONILLA's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LUISA FERNANDA BONILLA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. BONILLA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BONILLA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BONILLA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BONILLA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 August, 2021, and expires on 10 May, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. BONILLA's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad El Bosque, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 10 May 2028

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2016