THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville Allergy and Asthma Specialists
Unit 201
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053372112
Fax: 2893513026
Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: 18552100757
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 28 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annam Bhatti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhatti (CPSO#: 110548 )
Business Address: 201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville Allergy and Asthma Specialists
Unit 201
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053372112
Fax: 2893513026
Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: 18552100757
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 28 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annam Bhatti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhatti (CPSO#: 110548 )
Business Address: 201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNAM SHAKEEL BHATTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNAM SHAKEEL BHATTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2016