THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:13:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2578 Bristol Circle
Unit 3
Oakville Ontario L6H 7E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058493066
Fax: 9058493065
Address: 490 Bramalea Rd Unit 204
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
Phone: 9057926500
Fax: 9057926853
Address: 8990 Chinguacousy Rd. Unit 9
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5X6
Phone: (905) 450-5780
Fax: (905) 450-8689

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 01 Aug 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Bole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bole (CPSO#: 110561 )
Business Address: 204-490 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON L6T 0G1
9057926500
Business Address: 9-8990 Chinguacousy Rd
Brampton ON L6Y 5X6
9054505780

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2578 Bristol Circle
Unit 3
Oakville Ontario L6H 7E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058493066
Fax: 9058493065
Address: 490 Bramalea Rd Unit 204
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
Phone: 9057926500
Fax: 9057926853
Address: 8990 Chinguacousy Rd. Unit 9
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5X6
Phone: (905) 450-5780
Fax: (905) 450-8689

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 01 Aug 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Bole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bole (CPSO#: 110561 )
Business Address: 204-490 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON L6T 0G1
9057926500
Business Address: 9-8990 Chinguacousy Rd
Brampton ON L6Y 5X6
9054505780

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Nov 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 01 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Bole may practise medicine independently in endocrinology and
metabolism.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Bole may practise medicine independently in endocrinology and
metabolism.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2016