THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:54:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1935 Bank St
Bank Medical Centre
Ottawa ON K1V 8A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-521-2391
Extension: 1360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Aug 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Adeleye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Adeleye (CPSO#: 110565 )
Business Address: 1935 Bank St
Bank Medical Centre
Ottawa ON K1V 8A3
(613) 789-4385

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1935 Bank St
Bank Medical Centre
Ottawa ON K1V 8A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-521-2391
Extension: 1360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Aug 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Adeleye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Adeleye (CPSO#: 110565 )
Business Address: 1935 Bank St
Bank Medical Centre
Ottawa ON K1V 8A3
(613) 789-4385

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYODE OLAGOKE ADELEYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADELEYE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYODE OLAGOKE ADELEYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADELEYE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016