THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot St W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-2424
Fax: (519) 322-2727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 20 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Idris Yekinni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yekinni (CPSO#: 110592 )
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
3rd Floor
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 322-2424

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot St W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-2424
Fax: (519) 322-2727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 20 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Idris Yekinni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yekinni (CPSO#: 110592 )
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
3rd Floor
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 322-2424

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IDRIS OLATUNJI YEKINNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEKINNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IDRIS OLATUNJI YEKINNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEKINNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2016