THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 23:06:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10-3250 Schmon Pky
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-479-0223
Fax: 289-479-0224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eddie Y. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Liu (CPSO#: 110610 )
Business Address: 10-3250 Schmon Pky
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10-3250 Schmon Pky
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-479-0223
Fax: 289-479-0224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eddie Y. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Liu (CPSO#: 110610 )
Business Address: 10-3250 Schmon Pky
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDDIE YIXIAO LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDDIE YIXIAO LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2016