THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 09:54:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moore (CPSO#: 110617 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
6137377700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moore (CPSO#: 110617 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
6137377700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA MIEKO MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA MIEKO MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2016