THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:14:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Division of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: Ext. 89142
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20-865 York Mills Rd
Orthopedic Rehabilitation Institute
Suite 20
North York ON M3B 1Y6
Phone: (647) 349-7880
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bermuda
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MICHAEL CATAPANO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Catapano (CPSO#: 110629 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Division of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: Ext. 89142
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20-865 York Mills Rd
Orthopedic Rehabilitation Institute
Suite 20
North York ON M3B 1Y6
Phone: (647) 349-7880
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bermuda
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MICHAEL CATAPANO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Catapano (CPSO#: 110629 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CATAPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATAPANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CATAPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATAPANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2016