THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:59:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesiology
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mike Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zhu (CPSO#: 110638 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anesthesiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44890

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesiology
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mike Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zhu (CPSO#: 110638 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anesthesiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44890

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKE ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKE ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 May 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2016