THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:25:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux lookout Meno Ya win Health Center
Sioux Lookout Ontario P0V
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naba Al Saadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Al Saadi (CPSO#: 110669 )
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, FARSI
Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux lookout Meno Ya win Health Center
Sioux Lookout Ontario P0V
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naba Al Saadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Al Saadi (CPSO#: 110669 )
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABA AL SAADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SAADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABA AL SAADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SAADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016