THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-1525 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
Business Email: 905-582-0162
Phone: 9055820162
Fax: 2898373898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Ameer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Ameer (CPSO#: 110680 )
Business Address: Wellspace MD
Suite 111
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6L 1M1
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 2-1525 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
905-582-0162

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-1525 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
Business Email: 905-582-0162
Phone: 9055820162
Fax: 2898373898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Ameer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Ameer (CPSO#: 110680 )
Business Address: Wellspace MD
Suite 111
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6L 1M1
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 2-1525 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
905-582-0162

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERAL AHMED AL-AMEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AMEER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERAL AHMED AL-AMEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AMEER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2016