THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:35:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
Medical Trust Clinics
1428 Durham Regional Hwy 2
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-728-7915
Extension: 4
Fax: 905-443-0171
Address: 5995 Steeles Avenue East
(within Walmart)
Scarborough Ontario M1V 5P7
Phone: 905-728-7915
Fax: 905-443-0171

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Aug 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vibushitha Narendra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Narendra (CPSO#: 110691 )
Business Address: 1916 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L6
9054341662
Business Address: Medical Trust Clinics
2nd Floor
9057287915 Extn: ext 4
Business Address: 1428 Durham Regional HWY 2
Medical Trust Clinics
Courtice Ontario L1E 2J5
905-728-7915 Extn: 4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
Medical Trust Clinics
1428 Durham Regional Hwy 2
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-728-7915
Extension: 4
Fax: 905-443-0171
Address: 5995 Steeles Avenue East
(within Walmart)
Scarborough Ontario M1V 5P7
Phone: 905-728-7915
Fax: 905-443-0171

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Aug 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vibushitha Narendra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Narendra (CPSO#: 110691 )
Business Address: 1916 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L6
9054341662
Business Address: Medical Trust Clinics
2nd Floor
9057287915 Extn: ext 4
Business Address: 1428 Durham Regional HWY 2
Medical Trust Clinics
Courtice Ontario L1E 2J5
905-728-7915 Extn: 4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Jan 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 25 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vibushitha Narendra may practise medicine independently in endocrinology and metabolism,
and in internal medicine in an ambulatory setting, only.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vibushitha Narendra may practise medicine independently in endocrinology and metabolism,
and in internal medicine in an ambulatory setting, only.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2016