THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054578558
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Westmore Dr Suite 201
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 3Y6
Phone: 416-748-2800
Fax: 416-748-8865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 23 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 22 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR, LAMIAA MIGAHED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Migahed (CPSO#: 110713 )
Business Address: 418 North Service Road East
Oakville Ontario L6H 5R2

Corporation Name: Lamiaa Migahed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Migahed (CPSO#: 110713 )
Business Address: Suite 201
101 Westmore Drive
Toronto Ontario M9V 3Y6
(416) 748-2800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054578558
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Westmore Dr Suite 201
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 3Y6
Phone: 416-748-2800
Fax: 416-748-8865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 23 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 22 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR, LAMIAA MIGAHED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Migahed (CPSO#: 110713 )
Business Address: 418 North Service Road East
Oakville Ontario L6H 5R2

Corporation Name: Lamiaa Migahed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Migahed (CPSO#: 110713 )
Business Address: Suite 201
101 Westmore Drive
Toronto Ontario M9V 3Y6
(416) 748-2800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAMIAA MIGAHED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIGAHED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAMIAA MIGAHED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIGAHED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016