THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:09:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Front Avenue Resource Centre
25 Front Ave W
Brockville ON K6V 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. CHAWLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chawla (CPSO#: 110750 )
Business Address: 25 Front Ave W
Brockville ON K6V 4J2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Front Avenue Resource Centre
25 Front Ave W
Brockville ON K6V 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. CHAWLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chawla (CPSO#: 110750 )
Business Address: 25 Front Ave W
Brockville ON K6V 4J2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARAN CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARAN CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2016