THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Extension: 31001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salima Hassanaly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hassanaly (CPSO#: 110755 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Extension: 31001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salima Hassanaly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hassanaly (CPSO#: 110755 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALIMA ISABELLE HASSANALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANALY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALIMA ISABELLE HASSANALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANALY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2016