THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:16:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7117 Bathurst street
Vaughan Ontario L4J 2J6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KARIM ABDEL SHAHID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abdel Shahid (CPSO#: 110785 )
Business Address: 129 Bond Crescent
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 3L1
9057155260

Corporation Name: K. Abdel Shahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7117 Bathurst street
Vaughan Ontario L4J 2J6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KARIM ABDEL SHAHID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abdel Shahid (CPSO#: 110785 )
Business Address: 129 Bond Crescent
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 3L1
9057155260

Corporation Name: K. Abdel Shahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM AZMY SADEK ABDEL SHAHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL SHAHID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM AZMY SADEK ABDEL SHAHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL SHAHID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016