THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:59:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132182341
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Hutten-Czapski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hutten-Czapski (CPSO#: 110788 )
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Hospital
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Address: 100 Rollins Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Address: 110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances Ontario P9A 2B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132182341
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Hutten-Czapski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hutten-Czapski (CPSO#: 110788 )
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Hospital
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Address: 100 Rollins Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Address: 110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances Ontario P9A 2B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN SINCLAIR HUTTEN-CZAPSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTEN-CZAPSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN SINCLAIR HUTTEN-CZAPSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTEN-CZAPSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016