THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 601
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 751-0465
Fax: (416) 673-9363

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Curtis Foong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Foong (CPSO#: 110806 )
Business Address: 601-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
4167510465

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 601
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 751-0465
Fax: (416) 673-9363

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Curtis Foong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Foong (CPSO#: 110806 )
Business Address: 601-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
4167510465

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CURTIS IAN FOONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CURTIS IAN FOONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2016