THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:25:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 722 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M 8H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133832393
Fax: 6135420610

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 Feb 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Appireddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Appireddy (CPSO#: 110823 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Neurology Department, Connell 7
Room 703
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TELUGU
Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 722 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M 8H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133832393
Fax: 6135420610

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 Feb 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Appireddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Appireddy (CPSO#: 110823 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Neurology Department, Connell 7
Room 703
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARUTHI RAMANA REDDY APPIREDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPIREDDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARUTHI RAMANA REDDY APPIREDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPIREDDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2016