THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:41:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-2121
Extension: 3084
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 0B2
Phone: 705-740-6888
Fax: (705) 749-9611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Masud Taeri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taeri (CPSO#: 110826 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
7057432121 Extn: 3084

Corporation Name: DR. MASUD TAERI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Masud Taeri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-2121
Extension: 3084
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 0B2
Phone: 705-740-6888
Fax: (705) 749-9611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Masud Taeri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taeri (CPSO#: 110826 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
7057432121 Extn: 3084

Corporation Name: DR. MASUD TAERI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Masud Taeri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Aug 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 02 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Masud Taeri may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Masud Taeri may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016