THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:18:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lausanne, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Cardiology
Fontbonne Building, Room F506-1
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33867
Fax: (905) 521-6068

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Conen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Conen (CPSO#: 110832 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building
Room F506-1
50 Charleton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33867

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Lausanne, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Cardiology
Fontbonne Building, Room F506-1
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33867
Fax: (905) 521-6068

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Conen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Conen (CPSO#: 110832 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building
Room F506-1
50 Charleton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33867

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 11 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Conen may practise medicine independently in cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Conen may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lausanne, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016