THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 37 Holland street west
MEDSTARZ
Main Floor
Bradford Ontario L3Z 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-551-6777
Fax: 844-966-0695

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AMIR ZEINALY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zeinaly (CPSO#: 110836 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 37 Holland street west
MEDSTARZ
Main Floor
Bradford Ontario L3Z 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-551-6777
Fax: 844-966-0695

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AMIR ZEINALY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zeinaly (CPSO#: 110836 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR ZEINALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEINALY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR ZEINALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEINALY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016