THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:14:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: NNAMDI AZIKIWE UNIVERSITY, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 4615, 4603
Fax: 7052563494
Address: 123 EAST STREET
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 3C7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Old Garden River Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A5
Phone: 7059421872
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Uchenna Anyogu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Anyogu (CPSO#: 110853 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IBO
Medical School: NNAMDI AZIKIWE UNIVERSITY, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 4615, 4603
Fax: 7052563494
Address: 123 EAST STREET
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 3C7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Old Garden River Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A5
Phone: 7059421872
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Uchenna Anyogu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Anyogu (CPSO#: 110853 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UCHENNA GABRIEL ANYOGU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANYOGU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UCHENNA GABRIEL ANYOGU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANYOGU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: NNAMDI AZIKIWE UNIVERSITY, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2016