THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 605, 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-8550
Fax: (905) 604-8552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Si Yu Zhao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zhao (CPSO#: 110857 )
Business Address: 605 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 605, 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-8550
Fax: (905) 604-8552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Si Yu Zhao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zhao (CPSO#: 110857 )
Business Address: 605 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SI YU ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SI YU ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016