THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:47:29 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford Commons Medical centre
300 King George Rd.Unit H4
Brantford Ontario N3R5L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 304 8010
Fax: 519 304 8011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Kaldas & Nazmy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nazmy (CPSO#: 108160 ) Dr. N. Kaldas (CPSO#: 110868 )
Business Address: Suite H4
300 King George Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 5L8
(519) 304-8010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford Commons Medical centre
300 King George Rd.Unit H4
Brantford Ontario N3R5L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 304 8010
Fax: 519 304 8011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Kaldas & Nazmy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nazmy (CPSO#: 108160 ) Dr. N. Kaldas (CPSO#: 110868 )
Business Address: Suite H4
300 King George Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 5L8
(519) 304-8010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAHED NABIL RIAD KALDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALDAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAHED NABIL RIAD KALDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALDAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016