THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:54:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Tecumseh Rd E
Unit 344
Windsor ON N8X 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 256 3118
Fax: 519 419 2030
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Thoracic Surgery Division
Department of Surgery
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Techumseh Rd
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 24 Feb 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amgad Elsherif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsherif (CPSO#: 110886 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Division of Thoracic Surgery
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Address: 250 Tecumseh Rd E
Unit 155
Windsor ON N8X 2R3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Tecumseh Rd E
Unit 344
Windsor ON N8X 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 256 3118
Fax: 519 419 2030
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Thoracic Surgery Division
Department of Surgery
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Techumseh Rd
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 24 Feb 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amgad Elsherif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsherif (CPSO#: 110886 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Division of Thoracic Surgery
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Address: 250 Tecumseh Rd E
Unit 155
Windsor ON N8X 2R3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Feb 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 24 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amgad Ezzat Elsherif may practise medicine independently in thoracic
surgery.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amgad Ezzat Elsherif may practise medicine independently in thoracic
surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2016