THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:59:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 26 Forbes St
Cambridge Ontario N3C 2E2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519 658 4615
Fax: 5196584630

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nabeel Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ahmad (CPSO#: 110888 )
Business Address: 26 Forbes Street
Cambridge Ontario N3C 2E2
(519) 658-4615

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 26 Forbes St
Cambridge Ontario N3C 2E2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519 658 4615
Fax: 5196584630

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nabeel Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ahmad (CPSO#: 110888 )
Business Address: 26 Forbes Street
Cambridge Ontario N3C 2E2
(519) 658-4615

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABEEL AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABEEL AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2016