THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:13:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-579-0624
Fax: 226-215-3511
Address: 835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St-Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blv
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Peng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peng (CPSO#: 110910 )
Business Address: Suite 306
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 579-0624

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-579-0624
Fax: 226-215-3511
Address: 835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St-Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blv
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Peng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peng (CPSO#: 110910 )
Business Address: Suite 306
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 579-0624

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SI-LIANG PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SI-LIANG PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2016