THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:42:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-1670 North Service Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 7G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053380813
Fax: 9053385747

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Kate Healy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Healy (CPSO#: 110926 )
Business Address: 112-1670 North Service Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 7G3
905-338-0813

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-1670 North Service Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 7G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053380813
Fax: 9053385747

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Kate Healy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Healy (CPSO#: 110926 )
Business Address: 112-1670 North Service Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 7G3
905-338-0813

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE HEALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE HEALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016