THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-2345
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical record with Dr. Nir Pecchiloi, while he was at Nixon Family Medical Clinic, should contact Records Access Services Canada Inc.
Toll-Free at: 1-800-971-8038 ext. 702 or online at www.rasci.ca.
Date Received: 25 Apr 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nir Pecchioli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pecchioli (CPSO#: 110938 )
Business Address: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-2345
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical record with Dr. Nir Pecchiloi, while he was at Nixon Family Medical Clinic, should contact Records Access Services Canada Inc.
Toll-Free at: 1-800-971-8038 ext. 702 or online at www.rasci.ca.
Date Received: 25 Apr 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nir Pecchioli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pecchioli (CPSO#: 110938 )
Business Address: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIR PECCHIOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PECCHIOLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIR PECCHIOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PECCHIOLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016