THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:43:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Radiology
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705)267-2131
Extension: 2056
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Schulte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schulte (CPSO#: 110939 )
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Radiology
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Radiology
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705)267-2131
Extension: 2056
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Schulte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schulte (CPSO#: 110939 )
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Radiology
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ALOIS SCHULTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ALOIS SCHULTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2016