THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 13:31:51 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Southampton, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology & Hematology
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rishi Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Patel (CPSO#: 110957 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Southampton, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology & Hematology
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rishi Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Patel (CPSO#: 110957 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RISHI PIYUSH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RISHI PIYUSH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Southampton, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016