THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 02:23:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universita Degli Studi de Brescia, 2001
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Division of Cardiac Surgery
Bond 8th Floor
St, Michael's Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 864 3065
Fax: 416 864 3049
Address: 3-475 Bond St W
Durham Cardiology Clinic
Oshawa ON L1J 2M2
Phone: 905-447-6528
Fax: 905-225-6528
Address: Whitby Cardiovascular
3020 Brock St N
Whitby ON L1R 3J7
Phone: (905) 668-0416
Fax: (905) 668-8778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gianluigi Bisleri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bisleri (CPSO#: 110967 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery - Bond 8th Floor
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416- 864-3065

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Universita Degli Studi de Brescia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Division of Cardiac Surgery
Bond 8th Floor
St, Michael's Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 864 3065
Fax: 416 864 3049
Address: 3-475 Bond St W
Durham Cardiology Clinic
Oshawa ON L1J 2M2
Phone: 905-447-6528
Fax: 905-225-6528
Address: Whitby Cardiovascular
3020 Brock St N
Whitby ON L1R 3J7
Phone: (905) 668-0416
Fax: (905) 668-8778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gianluigi Bisleri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bisleri (CPSO#: 110967 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery - Bond 8th Floor
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416- 864-3065

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIANLUIGI BISLERI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the University of Toronto in which Dr. BISLERI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. BISLERI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIANLUIGI BISLERI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the University of Toronto in which Dr. BISLERI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. BISLERI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universita Degli Studi de Brescia, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2016