THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:56:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centro Healthcare Clinic
7777 Weston Road
Unit 114
Vaughan Ontario L4L 0G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 605 4744
Fax: 416 987 0585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moosa Fadhel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fadhel (CPSO#: 110968 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centro Healthcare Clinic
7777 Weston Road
Unit 114
Vaughan Ontario L4L 0G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 605 4744
Fax: 416 987 0585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moosa Fadhel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fadhel (CPSO#: 110968 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOOSA MOHAMEDRAZA FADHEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADHEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOOSA MOHAMEDRAZA FADHEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADHEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016