THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 272 Oxford St W
Serenity Medical Centre
N6H 1S9
London ON N6H 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196014999
Fax: 5196014997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Onunkwo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Onunkwo (CPSO#: 110977 )
Business Address: 272 Oxford St W
London ON N6H 1S9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 272 Oxford St W
Serenity Medical Centre
N6H 1S9
London ON N6H 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196014999
Fax: 5196014997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Onunkwo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Onunkwo (CPSO#: 110977 )
Business Address: 272 Oxford St W
London ON N6H 1S9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IFEANYI KODILINYE UGOCHUKWU ONUNKWO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONUNKWO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IFEANYI KODILINYE UGOCHUKWU ONUNKWO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONUNKWO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016