THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:35:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr D M Salako Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Salako (CPSO#: 111006 )
Business Address: A-120 King St W
Seniors’ Mental Health Regional Consultation Service
North Bay ON P1B 5Z7
7054943054
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: 200 - 1164 Devonshire Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 6X7
(705) 474-5885

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr D M Salako Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Salako (CPSO#: 111006 )
Business Address: A-120 King St W
Seniors’ Mental Health Regional Consultation Service
North Bay ON P1B 5Z7
7054943054
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: 200 - 1164 Devonshire Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 6X7
(705) 474-5885

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOKUN MATIN SALAKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOKUN MATIN SALAKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2016