THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Beijing Medical University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 Gainsborough Road
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196018621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Si Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Si (CPSO#: 111007 )
Business Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Business Address: Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
(519) 601-8621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Beijing Medical University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 Gainsborough Road
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196018621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Si Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Si (CPSO#: 111007 )
Business Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Business Address: Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
(519) 601-8621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FENGQIN SI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FENGQIN SI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Beijing Medical University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016