THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9025002166
Fax: 9027102070
Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
SCHC Geriatric Clinic
Suite 303
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: ‭(416) 847-4165‬
Fax: ‭(416) 410-7072
Address: 300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
Phone: (416) 847-8941‬
Fax: (416) 646-5111‬

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Xiao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Xiao (CPSO#: 111012 )
Business Address: 355 Adelaide Street West
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5V 1S2
(647) 497-7453
Business Address: 300 Silver Star Blvd
MINT Memory Clinic
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9025002166
Fax: 9027102070
Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
SCHC Geriatric Clinic
Suite 303
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: ‭(416) 847-4165‬
Fax: ‭(416) 410-7072
Address: 300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
Phone: (416) 847-8941‬
Fax: (416) 646-5111‬

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Xiao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Xiao (CPSO#: 111012 )
Business Address: 355 Adelaide Street West
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5V 1S2
(647) 497-7453
Business Address: 300 Silver Star Blvd
MINT Memory Clinic
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW HAN XIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW HAN XIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016