THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:30:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705-1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-481-4433
Fax: 416-481-7011
Address: 300-350 Rutherford Rd S
Clarity Eye Institute Brampton
Brampton ON L6W 4N6
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: 2238 Dundas Street West
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M6R 3A9
Phone: 416-760-8777
Fax: 416-760-0748

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PAUL FREUND MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freund (CPSO#: 111027 )
Business Address: 1849 Yonge St
Suite 705
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Business Address: A5-9135 Keele St
Concord ON L4K 0J4
Business Address: 300-350 Rutherford Rd S
Brampton ON L6W 4N6
Business Address: 2238 Dundas St W
Clarity Eye Institute
Suite 308
Toronto ON M6R 3A9
416-760-8777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705-1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-481-4433
Fax: 416-481-7011
Address: 300-350 Rutherford Rd S
Clarity Eye Institute Brampton
Brampton ON L6W 4N6
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: 2238 Dundas Street West
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M6R 3A9
Phone: 416-760-8777
Fax: 416-760-0748

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PAUL FREUND MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freund (CPSO#: 111027 )
Business Address: 1849 Yonge St
Suite 705
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Business Address: A5-9135 Keele St
Concord ON L4K 0J4
Business Address: 300-350 Rutherford Rd S
Brampton ON L6W 4N6
Business Address: 2238 Dundas St W
Clarity Eye Institute
Suite 308
Toronto ON M6R 3A9
416-760-8777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL RICHARD FREUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREUND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL RICHARD FREUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREUND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2016