THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-550 Matheson Blvd W
Complete MD Family Practice & Med Spa
Mississauga ON L5R 4B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057123323
Fax: 9055933130
Address: 4-7070 McLaughlin Rd
Mississauga ON L5W 1W7
Phone: 905 795 2873
Fax: 905 795 9114
Address: 108-550 Matheson Blvd W
Mississauga ON L5R 4B8
Phone: 9057123323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gunjan Maggo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maggo (CPSO#: 111029 )
Business Address: 125 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga Ontario L5G 1E5
Business Address: 4-7070 McLaughlin Road
Mississauga Ontario L5W 1W7
(905) 795-2873
Business Address: 108-550 Matheson Blvd W
Complete MD Family Practice & Med Spa
Mississauga ON L5R 4B8
9057123323

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-550 Matheson Blvd W
Complete MD Family Practice & Med Spa
Mississauga ON L5R 4B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057123323
Fax: 9055933130
Address: 4-7070 McLaughlin Rd
Mississauga ON L5W 1W7
Phone: 905 795 2873
Fax: 905 795 9114
Address: 108-550 Matheson Blvd W
Mississauga ON L5R 4B8
Phone: 9057123323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gunjan Maggo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maggo (CPSO#: 111029 )
Business Address: 125 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga Ontario L5G 1E5
Business Address: 4-7070 McLaughlin Road
Mississauga Ontario L5W 1W7
(905) 795-2873
Business Address: 108-550 Matheson Blvd W
Complete MD Family Practice & Med Spa
Mississauga ON L5R 4B8
9057123323

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUNJAN MAGGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGGO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUNJAN MAGGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGGO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2016