THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:33:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chhatrapati Shahuji Maharaj Medical Univ, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11615 McVean Drive
Brampton Ontario L6P 4N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059135511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 551 Cityview Blvd
Unit 15-16
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0Z4
Phone: 905-553-4499
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manwal & Dr. Rawat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rawat (CPSO#: 112393 ) Dr. A. Manwal (CPSO#: 111057 )
Business Address: Suite 15-16
551 Cityview Boulevard
York Ontario L4H 0Z4
(905) 553-4499

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Chhatrapati Shahuji Maharaj Medical Univ, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11615 McVean Drive
Brampton Ontario L6P 4N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059135511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 551 Cityview Blvd
Unit 15-16
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0Z4
Phone: 905-553-4499
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manwal & Dr. Rawat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rawat (CPSO#: 112393 ) Dr. A. Manwal (CPSO#: 111057 )
Business Address: Suite 15-16
551 Cityview Boulevard
York Ontario L4H 0Z4
(905) 553-4499

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIT MANWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIT MANWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chhatrapati Shahuji Maharaj Medical Univ, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2016