THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:56:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 655 Bay St
TRIO Fertility
Unit 1101
Toronto ON M5G 2K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-506-0804
Extension: 3321
Fax: 416-599-5647

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KATHARINE PHILLIPS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Phillips (CPSO#: 111058 )
Business Address: 655 Bay St
Suite 1101
Toronto ON M5G 2K4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 655 Bay St
TRIO Fertility
Unit 1101
Toronto ON M5G 2K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-506-0804
Extension: 3321
Fax: 416-599-5647

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KATHARINE PHILLIPS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Phillips (CPSO#: 111058 )
Business Address: 655 Bay St
Suite 1101
Toronto ON M5G 2K4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHARINE RUTH BOWLAND PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHARINE RUTH BOWLAND PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2016