THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:28:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whitby Medical Arts Urgent Care
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 436-2273
Fax: 9054362263

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Mar 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S Arunthavanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arunthavanathan (CPSO#: 111064 )
Business Address: 1615 Dundas St E
Whitby ON L1N 2L1
905-436-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whitby Medical Arts Urgent Care
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 436-2273
Fax: 9054362263

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Mar 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S Arunthavanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arunthavanathan (CPSO#: 111064 )
Business Address: 1615 Dundas St E
Whitby ON L1N 2L1
905-436-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAYENTHAVY ARUNTHAVANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARUNTHAVANATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAYENTHAVY ARUNTHAVANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARUNTHAVANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2016