THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:35:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Government Rd E
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N3P4
Phone: 7055675251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zale Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Rosenberg (CPSO#: 111071 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Government Rd E
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N3P4
Phone: 7055675251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zale Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Rosenberg (CPSO#: 111071 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZALE BENJAMIN ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZALE BENJAMIN ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2016