THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:22:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19101 B Leslie Street
Sharon Ontario L0G 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 478-1300
Fax: (905) 4781303
Address: 5025 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 3E5
Phone: 9058265555
Fax: 9052861237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Rofeal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rofeal (CPSO#: 111074 )
Business Address: 19101 Leslie Street
Sharon Ontario L0G 1V0
(905) 478-1300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19101 B Leslie Street
Sharon Ontario L0G 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 478-1300
Fax: (905) 4781303
Address: 5025 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 3E5
Phone: 9058265555
Fax: 9052861237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Rofeal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rofeal (CPSO#: 111074 )
Business Address: 19101 Leslie Street
Sharon Ontario L0G 1V0
(905) 478-1300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NAGY HELMY ROFEAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROFEAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NAGY HELMY ROFEAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROFEAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2016