THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:55:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Dr E
Windsor Ontario N8S 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-4122
Fax: (519) 974-0890
Address: Tecumseh Manning Medical Clinic
13278 Tecumseh Rd E #101
Tecumseh Ontario N8N3T6
Phone: 5199795260
Fax: 5199798085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arshinder Kaur Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheema (CPSO#: 111091 )
Business Address: Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor Ontario N8S 1E1
(519) 945-3223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Dr E
Windsor Ontario N8S 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-4122
Fax: (519) 974-0890
Address: Tecumseh Manning Medical Clinic
13278 Tecumseh Rd E #101
Tecumseh Ontario N8N3T6
Phone: 5199795260
Fax: 5199798085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arshinder Kaur Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheema (CPSO#: 111091 )
Business Address: Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor Ontario N8S 1E1
(519) 945-3223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARSHINDER KAUR CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARSHINDER KAUR CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2016