THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-3161 Strandherd Dr
Nepean ON K2J 5N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-823-7766
Fax: 613-823-0063

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goulets Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Goulets (CPSO#: 111096 )
Business Address: 633 Bow Valley Dr
Gloucester ON K1V 2G9
+1 05145830070

Corporation Name: Goulets Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-3161 Strandherd Dr
Nepean ON K2J 5N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-823-7766
Fax: 613-823-0063

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goulets Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Goulets (CPSO#: 111096 )
Business Address: 633 Bow Valley Dr
Gloucester ON K1V 2G9
+1 05145830070

Corporation Name: Goulets Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VYACHESLAV GOULETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULETS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VYACHESLAV GOULETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULETS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2016