THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-401-4678
Fax: 289-401-4676
Address: 3580 Thomas St
Intrepid Health Churchill Meadows
Mississauga ON L5M 0N7
Phone: 905 412 1008
Fax: 647 277 9002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Nov 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noha Ali-Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ali-Ahmad (CPSO#: 111128 )
Business Address: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
2894014678

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-401-4678
Fax: 289-401-4676
Address: 3580 Thomas St
Intrepid Health Churchill Meadows
Mississauga ON L5M 0N7
Phone: 905 412 1008
Fax: 647 277 9002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Nov 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noha Ali-Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ali-Ahmad (CPSO#: 111128 )
Business Address: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
2894014678

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Apr 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 19 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Noha Yussef Ali-Ahmad may practise medicine independently in paediatrics in
an outpatient setting, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Noha Yussef Ali-Ahmad may practise medicine independently in paediatrics in
an outpatient setting, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2016